PA HB185 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 12, 1986 (P.L.1559, No.169), known as the Whistleblower Law, further providing for the definitions of "appropriate authority," "good faith report" and "public body," for protection of employees and for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for the definitions of "appropriate authority," "good faith report" and "public body," for protection of employees and for penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 185 PN 243, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-02HouseAct No. 88
2014-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2014-07-01HousePresented to the Governor
2014-06-30HouseSigned in Senate
2014-06-29HouseSigned in House
2014-06-29HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (198-0)
2014-06-29HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2014-06-28HouseReferred to RULES
2014-06-27HouseIn the House
2014-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2014-06-26SenateAmended on third consideration
2014-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2014-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2014-06-24SenateReported as committed
2013-02-08SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2013-02-05SenateIn the Senate
2013-02-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2013-02-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2013-02-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-02-04HouseSecond consideration
2013-01-23HouseRemoved from table
2013-01-22HouseLaid on the table
2013-01-22HouseFirst consideration
2013-01-22HouseReported as amended
2013-01-18HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2013&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=185
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=0162
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=0243
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=0162
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=0243
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=3863
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=37
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/24/2014&rNbr=976

Bill Comments 750

feedback