PA HB1849 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 39 in Dauphin County, from Dover Road to Forest Hills Drive, as the Officer Mark Gaspich Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 39 in Dauphin County, from Dover Road to Forest Hills Drive, as the Officer Mark Gaspich Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1849 PN 2556, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-12-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-12-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-17HouseSecond consideration
2019-12-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as committed
2019-09-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback