PA HB1847 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1463, No.163), known as the Credit Reporting Agency Act, further providing for definitions, for security freeze and for fees; providing for credit monitoring services; prohibiting the waiver of rights; and providing for protected persons security freeze.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for security freeze and for fees; providing for credit monitoring services; prohibiting the waiver of rights; and providing for protected persons security freeze.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1847 PN 3129, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1847 PN 2567, 2017 A5726, BARRAR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1847 PN 2567, 2017 A5726, BARRAR, SUSP RULES (Y: 180 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1847 PN 2567, 2017 A5721, DRISCOLL (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2018-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-01-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-02HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-18HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-16HouseReported as committed
2017-10-13HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1847
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1847&pn=2567
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1847&pn=3129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=980
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1016
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1330

Bill Comments

feedback