PA HB1846 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Communications & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 22, 2005 (P.L.474, No.94), known as the Breach of Personal Information Notification Act, further providing for definitions, for notification of breach and for notice exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for notification of breach and for notice exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1846 PN 3128, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1846 PN 2588, 2017 A5720, ELLIS (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A03852 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A03851 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateReferred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
2018-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-01-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-02HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-18HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-16HouseReported as amended
2017-10-13HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1846
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1846&pn=2566
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1846&pn=2588
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1846&pn=3128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=974
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=978
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1030
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1329

Bill Comments

feedback