PA HB1845 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2026 over the North Branch Blacklick Creek, Buffington Township, Indiana County, as First Lieutenant Theodore P. Pytash Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2026 over the North Branch Blacklick Creek, Buffington Township, Indiana County, as First Lieutenant Theodore P. Pytash Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1845 PN 2584, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1845 PN 2584, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03824 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateAct No. 12
2018-04-16SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-04-09SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-09SenateSigned in House
2018-03-19SenateSigned in Senate
2018-03-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-02-05SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-12-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-10-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-18HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-17HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-16HouseReported as amended
2017-10-04HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1845
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1845&pn=2541
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1845&pn=2584
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=987
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=986
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/24/2017&RollCallId=1035
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=882
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=665
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=419

Bill Comments

feedback