PA HB1842 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 22, 1937 (P.L.1987, No.394), known as The Clean Streams Law, in other pollutions and potential pollution, providing for notice of discharge endangering public health or environment.
Title
In other pollutions and potential pollution, providing for notice of discharge endangering public health or environment.
Sponsors
Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Joe Hamm [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Jack Rader [R] | Rep. Christopher Quinn [R] | Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] |
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1842 PN 2231, FP (Y: 108 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02445 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1842 PN 2231, FP (Y: 108 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02445 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2021-12-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (108-95) |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-13 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-09-09 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |