PA HB1842 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for concealing death of child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for concealing death of child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-13 - House - HB 1842 PN 3199, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - HB 1842 PN 3099, 2011 A8910, MULLERY (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-16SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2012-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2012-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2012-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-03-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2012-02-15HouseRemoved from table
2012-02-14HouseLaid on the table
2012-02-14HouseFirst consideration
2012-02-14HouseReported as amended
2011-09-22HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1842
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1842&pn=2381
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1842&pn=3099
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1842&pn=3199
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1184
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1202

Bill Comments

feedback