PA HB1842 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 9 2009 - 25% progression
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, providing for electronic prior approval for Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for electronic prior approval for Medicaid.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-14 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2010-09-14 Removed from table
2010-09-13 Laid on the table
2010-09-13 Re-reported as committed
2010-07-02 Re-committed to RULES
2010-07-02 First consideration
2010-07-02 Reported as amended
2009-07-09 Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback