PA HB184 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal homicide, further providing for the offense of causing or aiding suicide; and, in depositions and witnesses, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In criminal homicide, further providing for the offense of causing or aiding suicide; and, in depositions and witnesses, further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 184 PN 1884, CONCUR (Y: 152 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 184 PN 1884, Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 184 PN 964, FP (Y: 162 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 184 PN 152, 2021 A356, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 184 PN 152, 2021 A372, KEEFER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30HouseAct No. 71
2021-09-30HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-09-22HousePresented to the Governor
2021-09-21HouseSigned in Senate
2021-09-21HouseSigned in House
2021-09-21HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (152-49)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-25HouseIn the House
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (34-16)
2021-06-22SenateRe-reported as amended
2021-04-28SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-28SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-21SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-21SenateReported as committed
2021-04-09SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-04-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (162-39)
2021-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-21HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=184
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0184&pn=0152
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0184&pn=0964
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0184&pn=1884
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0184P0964.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0184P1884.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0184P1884.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=58
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=67
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=68
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=263
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=140
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=04/21/2021&RollCallId=124
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2021&RollCallId=404
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=787
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=235
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=479

Bill Comments

feedback