PA HB1836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-02HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-17HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-17HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-17HouseReported as committed
2017-10-10HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback