PA HB1835 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for definitions, for award of grants and for requiring fire companies and emergency medical services companies to establish a social media policy in order to be eligible to receive grant funds.
Title
In grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for definitions, for award of grants and for requiring fire companies and emergency medical services companies to establish a social media policy in order to be eligible to receive grant funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |