PA HB1835 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for definitions, for award of grants and for requiring fire companies and emergency medical services companies to establish a social media policy in order to be eligible to receive grant funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for definitions, for award of grants and for requiring fire companies and emergency medical services companies to establish a social media policy in order to be eligible to receive grant funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-02HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-17HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-17HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-17HouseReported as committed
2017-10-10HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback