PA HB1830 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the act of July 1, 1978 (P.L.584, No.109), entitled "An act establishing an agency to create the linkage necessary for the planning of an economic development system for Pennsylvania, and making an appropriation."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the act of July 1, 1978 (P.L.584, No.109), entitled "An act establishing an agency to create the linkage necessary for the planning of an economic development system for Pennsylvania, and making an appropriation."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1830 PN 2501, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2020-01-14SenateIn the Senate
2020-01-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2020-01-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-12-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-29HouseReported as committed
2019-09-18HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback