PA HB183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 18, 1982 (P.L.549, No.159), entitled "An act providing for the administration of certain Commonwealth farmland within the Department of Agriculture," further providing for agricultural land conservation assistance grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of June 18, 1982 (P.L.549, No.159), entitled "An act providing for the administration of certain Commonwealth farmland within the Department of Agriculture," further providing for agricultural land conservation assistance grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 183 PN 151, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2021-03-23SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-22HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-17HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-15HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-15HouseReported as committed
2021-01-21HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback