PA HB1829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for home care, home health and older adult daily living center services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for home care, home health and older adult daily living center services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1829 PN 2737, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04784 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04762 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-26SenateReported as amended
2018-01-02SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-12-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as amended
2017-09-27HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1829
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1829&pn=2496
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1829&pn=2737
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1829&pn=4106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1059
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1060
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1061
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=902
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=09/26/2018&RollCallId=1128

Bill Comments

feedback