PA HB1822 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 24 (Education) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for suicide prevention in institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for suicide prevention in institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1822 PN 4045, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1822 PN 4045, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A09232 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 110
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-15SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-15SenateReported as committed
2018-10-12SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-10-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-10-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-01HouseSecond consideration
2018-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as amended
2017-09-26HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1822
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1822&pn=2479
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1822&pn=4045
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1898
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1900
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2026
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1179
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1221
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=735

Bill Comments

feedback