PA HB182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Title
Further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 182 PN 1071, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 182 PN 1071, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor: HB 182 PN 175, 2015 A446, GROVE (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor: HB 182 PN 175, 2015 A388, GROVE (Y: 182 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 182 PN 1071, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor: HB 182 PN 175, 2015 A446, GROVE (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor: HB 182 PN 175, 2015 A388, GROVE (Y: 182 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Act No. 8 |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-2) |
2015-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-01 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-03-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-11 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |