PA HB1816 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for assistance to volunteer fire companies, ambulance service and rescue squads.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for assistance to volunteer fire companies, ambulance service and rescue squads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1816 PN 2473, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1816 PN 2473, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-10-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-10-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-22 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-16 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |