PA HB1813 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for military child advance enrollment.
Title
In pupils and attendance, providing for military child advance enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1813 PN 3321, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1813 PN 3269, 2021 A5105 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04846 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1813 PN 3321, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1813 PN 3269, 2021 A5105 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04846 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-08-31 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |