PA HB1811 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in penalties and disposition of fines, further providing for surcharge; providing for automated license plate reader systems; imposing penalties; and establishing the ALPR Equipment Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In penalties and disposition of fines, further providing for surcharge; providing for automated license plate reader systems; imposing penalties; and establishing the ALPR Equipment Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1811 PN 2800, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04120 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-26SenateReported as amended
2018-01-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-23SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-0)
2018-01-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-01-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-11HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-11HouseReported as amended
2017-09-21HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1811
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1811&pn=2462
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1811&pn=2800
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1811&pn=4108
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1157
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=965
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1225
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=09/26/2018&RollCallId=1133

Bill Comments

feedback