PA HB181 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 100 from the intersection of Main Street and Tilghman Street in Upper Macungie Township, Lehigh County, to the intersection of Claussville Road and Kernsville Road in Lowhill Township, Lehigh County, as the Captain Mark T. Resh Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 100 from the intersection of Main Street and Tilghman Street in Upper Macungie Township, Lehigh County, to the intersection of Claussville Road and Kernsville Road in Lowhill Township, Lehigh County, as the Captain Mark T. Resh Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 181 PN 143, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 181 PN 143, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2017-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |