PA HB1808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1808 PN 3919, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1808 PN 3919, A7861, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-7861 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1808 PN 3919, A7679, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-7679 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1808 PN 3919, A7850, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-7850 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1808 PN 3919, FP (Y: 155 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A06128 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25SenateAct No. 127
2020-11-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-11-19SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19SenateSigned in Senate
2020-11-19SenateSigned in House
2020-11-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (30-19)
2020-11-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-20SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-03SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-03SenateReported as committed
2020-07-13SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2020-07-07SenateIn the Senate
2020-07-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (155-46)
2020-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-24HouseSecond consideration
2020-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-10HouseReported as amended
2019-09-16HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1808
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1808&pn=2466
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1808&pn=3919
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=2201
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=2202
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=2281
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1491
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2340
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=9&theDate=09/03/2020&RollCallId=1075
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/16/2020&RollCallId=1284
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=747
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=748
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=749
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=750

Bill Comments

feedback