PA HB1803 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from the General Fund to the Department of Human Services for the purpose of medical assistance payments - hospital-based burn centers for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016.
Title
Making an appropriation from the General Fund to the Department of Human Services for the purpose of medical assistance payments - hospital-based burn centers for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1803 PN 2763, FP (Y: 117 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1803 PN 2763, FP (Y: 117 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (117-61) |
2016-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-02-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-08 | House | Second consideration |
2016-01-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-26 | House | First consideration |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |