PA HB1802 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from the General Fund to the Executive Offices for the purpose of child advocacy centers for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016.
Title
Making an appropriation from the General Fund to the Executive Offices for the purpose of child advocacy centers for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1802 PN 2762, FP (Y: 127 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1802 PN 2762, FP (Y: 127 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (127-53) |
2016-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-02-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-08 | House | Second consideration |
2016-01-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-26 | House | First consideration |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |