PA HB1800 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, as follows: in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions, providing for legislative authority over elections, establishing the Bureau of Election Audits and providing for special standing in challenges to the Election Code; in the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and providing for reports on implementation of elections; in county boards of elections, further providing for powers and duties of county boards and providing for county boards of elections and satellite offices; in district election officers, further providing for district election boards and election, for qualifications of election officers, for tie votes for judge and inspector, for clerks of election and machine inspectors, for vacancies in election boards, appointment, judge and majority inspector to be members of majority party and minority inspector to be member of minority party, for election officers to be sworn, for oath of judge of election, for oaths of inspectors of election, for oaths of clerks of election, for oath of machine inspectors, for power of election officers to administer oaths, for compensation of district election officers and for appointment of watchers;

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As follows: in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions, providing for legislative authority over elections, establishing the Bureau of Election Audits and providing for special standing in challenges to the Election Code; in the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and providing for reports on implementation of elections; in county boards of elections, further providing for powers and duties of county boards and providing for county boards of elections and satellite offices; in district election officers, further providing for district election boards and election, for qualifications of election officers, for tie votes for judge and inspector, for clerks of election and machine inspectors, for vacancies in election boards, appointment, judge and majority inspector to be members of majority party and minority inspector to be member of minority party, for election officers to be sworn, for oath of judge of election, for oaths of inspectors of election, for oaths of clerks of election, for oath of machine inspectors, for power of election officers to administer oaths, for compensation of district election officers and for appointment of watchers;

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2125, 2021 A2942 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2125, 2021 A2957 (Y: 110 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-11-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-11-10HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-09-27HouseReported as committed
2021-09-20HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1800
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1800&pn=2125
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1800&pn=2431
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/27/2021&RollCallId=843
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=626
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=627

Bill Comments

feedback