PA HB1800 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for medication synchronization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for medication synchronization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 3224, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-13SenateReported as amended
2018-05-18SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2018-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-18HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-16HouseReported as committed
2018-04-02HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1800
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1800&pn=3224
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1800&pn=3681
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1432
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1496
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1214
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=950

Bill Comments

feedback