PA HB18 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-14)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 1, 1966 (1965 P.L.1656, No.581), known as The Borough Code, in contracts, further providing for regulation of contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In contracts, further providing for regulation of contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2012-03-27HouseRemoved from table
2012-01-18HouseLaid on the table
2012-01-18HouseFirst consideration
2012-01-18HouseReported as committed
2011-10-04HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback