PA HB18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Re-referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for prescription drugs and the treatment of work-related injuries; and, in procedure, further providing for peer review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In liability and compensation, further providing for prescription drugs and the treatment of work-related injuries; and, in procedure, further providing for peer review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - House - House Human Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 2014, MOT RECOM HUMAN SERVICES, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 102 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01831 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01754 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseRe-referred to RULES
2017-06-21HouseReported with request to re-refer to RULES
2017-06-20HouseRe-committed to HUMAN SERVICES
2017-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-14HouseReported as amended
2017-02-13HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=18
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0018&pn=0463
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0018&pn=2014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=595
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=599
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=593
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=523
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=683
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=698

Bill Comments

feedback