PA HB1796 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preemptions, providing for protection for victims of abuse or crime.
Title
In preemptions, providing for protection for victims of abuse or crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | Senate | Act No. 200 |
2014-10-31 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 2870 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-01-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |