PA HB1793 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial; and providing for its powers and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Pennsylvania Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial; and providing for its powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1793 PN 2594, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03873 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03565 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-27SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-27SenateReported as committed
2017-12-04SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-11-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-11-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2017-11-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-25HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-17HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-17HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-17HouseReported as amended
2017-09-18HouseReferred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1793
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1793&pn=2435
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1793&pn=2594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=1006
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=1007
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=1008
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1067
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=03/27/2018&RollCallId=747

Bill Comments

feedback