PA HB1792 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 1 (General Provisions), 2 (Administrative Law and Procedure), 3 (Agriculture), 7 (Banks and Banking), 12 (Commerce and Trade), 15 (Corporations and Unincorporated Associations), 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries), 23 (Domestic Relations), 25 (Elections), 30 (Fish), 34 (Game), 35 (Health and Safety), 37 (Historical and Museums), 40 (Insurance), 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure), 51 (Military Affairs), 53 (Municipalities Generally), 54 (Names), 61 (Prisons and Parole), 62 (Procurement), 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations), 66 (Public Utilities), 68 (Real and Personal Property), 71 (State Government), 74 (Transportation) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, making editorial changes relating to obsolete references to certain Commonwealth agencies, secretaries and acts relating thereto.
Title
Making editorial changes relating to obsolete references to certain Commonwealth agencies, secretaries and acts relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 2420, 2021 A3447 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02953 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02953 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-16 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-08-16 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |