PA HB1792 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3465, FP (Y: 105 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6811, BRADFORD (Y: 71 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6801, DALEY (Y: 82 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6618, DALEY (Y: 59 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6553, DALEY (Y: 71 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6538, KRUEGER-BRANEKY (Y: 71 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6805, MCCARTER (Y: 72 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6556, COMITTA (Y: 73 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6548, COMITTA (Y: 72 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1792 PN 3168, 2017 A6534, COMITTA (Y: 154 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A05725 (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05725 (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (105-82)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-13HouseReported as amended (Amendment to Printer's No. 2434)
2018-03-08HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3087
2017-09-18HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1792
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1792&pn=2434
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1792&pn=3087
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1792&pn=3168
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1792&pn=3465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1316
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1315
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1169
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1171
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1172
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1173
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1174
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1175
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1176
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1228

Bill Comments

feedback