PA HB179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-04HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-19HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-19HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-08HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback