PA HB179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Day [R] | Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] | Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2017-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-10 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |