PA HB179 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-14 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-14 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1907 (P.L.560, No.373), entitled "An act designating the official flag of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and describing the same; providing for the carrying of such flag by the regiments of the National Guard of Pennsylvania; authorizing the Secretary of the Commonwealth to provide, and have deposited in the office of Secretary of the Commonwealth, a model of said flag, and making an appropriation therefor," further providing for specifications for the official flag of the Commonwealth.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1907 (P.L.560, No.373), entitled "An act designating the official flag of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and describing the same; providing for the carrying of such flag by the regiments of the National Guard of Pennsylvania; authorizing the Secretary of the Commonwealth to provide, and have deposited in the office of Secretary of the Commonwealth, a model of said flag, and making an appropriation therefor," further providing for specifications for the official flag of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-14 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-06-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-07 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-04-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-23 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-23 | First consideration | |
2007-04-23 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-20 | Re-referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-03-20 | Reported with request to re-refer to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-02-01 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=179 |