PA HB1787 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of Kane, McKean County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of Kane, McKean County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1787 PN 2422, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1787 PN 2422, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-12-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-10-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-03 | House | Second consideration |
2017-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-09-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |