PA HB1787 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-17)
Status: Passed on October 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-04 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-17)
Status: Passed on October 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-04 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 1013 in Philadelphia County as the Michael R. Goodwin, Sr. Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 1013 in Philadelphia County as the Michael R. Goodwin, Sr. Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1787 PN 2733, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1787 PN 2733, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1787 PN 2733, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-04 | Senate | Act No. 105 |
2016-10-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-23 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-22 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |