PA HB178 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in administration of act, further providing for records of and reports by employers; in compensation, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation and for rate and amount of compensation; in determination of compensation, appeals, reviews and procedure, further providing for determination of compensation appeals and for decision of referee and further appeals and reviews; and, in shared-work program, further providing for participating employer responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In administration of act, further providing for records of and reports by employers; in compensation, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation and for rate and amount of compensation; in determination of compensation, appeals, reviews and procedure, further providing for determination of compensation appeals and for decision of referee and further appeals and reviews; and, in shared-work program, further providing for participating employer responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 178 PN 1370, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 178 PN 1370, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 178 PN 146, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseAct No. 30
2021-06-30HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-25HouseSigned in House
2021-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-24HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-24HouseIn the House
2021-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-06-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-04-28SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-28SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-27SenateReported as amended
2021-02-11SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2021-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-28HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-15HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=178
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0178&pn=0146
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0178&pn=1370
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0178P0146.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0178P1370.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0178P1370.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=40
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=28
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=98
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=141
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=426
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=212
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=443
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=783

Bill Comments

feedback