PA HB1778 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1005, also known as Castor Avenue, over the Frankford Creek in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, as the Officer Gary Frank Skerski Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1005, also known as Castor Avenue, over the Frankford Creek in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, as the Officer Gary Frank Skerski Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1778 PN 2405, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1778 PN 2405, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-22SenateAct No. 74
2017-12-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-13SenateSigned in House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-15SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-25SenateReported as committed
2017-10-05SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-10-02SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-10-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-27HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-25HouseReported as committed
2017-09-12HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1778
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1778&pn=2405
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=902
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=721
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/02/2017&RollCallId=932
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=10/25/2017&RollCallId=525
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=374

Bill Comments

feedback