PA HB1770 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over Crooked Creek, Rayne Township, Indiana County, as the SFC Randy McCaulley Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over Crooked Creek, Rayne Township, Indiana County, as the SFC Randy McCaulley Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1770 PN 2361, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1770 PN 2361, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |