PA HB1766 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for standard valuation; and making related repeals regarding Act 284 of 1921 and Act 285 of 1921.
Title
Providing for standard valuation; and making related repeals regarding Act 284 of 1921 and Act 285 of 1921.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1766 PN 3382, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1766 PN 3382, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1766 PN 2945, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05974 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1766 PN 3382, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1766 PN 3382, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1766 PN 2945, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05974 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Act No. 59 |
2016-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-21 | House | Signed in House |
2016-06-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-06-14 | House | In the House |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2016-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-21 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |