PA HB176 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for grants to regional police departments; establishing the Law Enforcement Grant Program Fund; imposing powers and duties on the Center for Local Government Services, the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; providing for transfers from the State Gaming Fund; and establishing the Law Enforcement and Treatment Grant Program.
Title
Providing for grants to regional police departments; establishing the Law Enforcement Grant Program Fund; imposing powers and duties on the Center for Local Government Services, the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; providing for transfers from the State Gaming Fund; and establishing the Law Enforcement and Treatment Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 3088, FP (Y: 176 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 170, 2015 A6268, FRANKEL (Y: 106 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 170, 2015 A6241, KLUNK (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 170, 2015 A6317, WHITE (Y: 185 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 170, 2015 A6268, FRANKEL (Y: 106 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 170, 2015 A6241, KLUNK (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 170, 2015 A6317, WHITE (Y: 185 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (176-19) |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to FINANCE |