PA HB1756 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 20, 1982 (P.L.1404, No.325), known as the Self-Service Storage Facility Act, further providing for owner's lien, for enforcement of lien, for notice, for advertisement of sale and for location of sale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for owner's lien, for enforcement of lien, for notice, for advertisement of sale and for location of sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04006 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2020-03-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-21HouseReported as amended
2019-08-16HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback