PA HB1751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) and 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in associations and organizations relating to boroughs, further providing for authorization and expenses; and, in city officers and employees relating to third class cities, further providing for Pennsylvania Municipal League and other municipal affairs organizations.
Title
In associations and organizations relating to boroughs, further providing for authorization and expenses; and, in city officers and employees relating to third class cities, further providing for Pennsylvania Municipal League and other municipal affairs organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1751 PN 2832, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03598 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1751 PN 2832, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03598 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-08-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |