PA HB1747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for prohibited conduct during emergency; and, in Commonwealth services, further providing for general authority of Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for prohibited conduct during emergency; and, in Commonwealth services, further providing for general authority of Governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1747 PN 2338, FP (Y: 127 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2020-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (127-74)
2020-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23HouseSecond consideration
2020-06-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as committed
2019-08-16HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback