PA HB1741 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on August 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for authority to issue liquor licenses to hotels, restaurants and clubs, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales and for premises to be vacated by patrons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for authority to issue liquor licenses to hotels, restaurants and clubs, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales and for premises to be vacated by patrons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-14 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-14HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as committed
2017-08-24HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback