PA HB174 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax and for exemption certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax and for exemption certificates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2011-05-04HouseRemoved from table
2011-04-04HouseLaid on the table
2011-04-04HouseFirst consideration
2011-04-04HouseReported as committed
2011-01-24HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback