PA HB174 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-13)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for a special registration plate for veterans and members of United States military airborne units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for a special registration plate for veterans and members of United States military airborne units.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2007-12-11 Laid on the table
2007-11-13 Removed from table
2007-10-29 Laid on the table
2007-09-25 Re-reported as committed
2007-09-24 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2007-09-24 Removed from table
2007-09-17 Laid on the table
2007-09-17 Re-reported as committed
2007-07-02 Re-committed to RULES
2007-07-02 First consideration
2007-07-02 Reported as amended
2007-02-01 Referred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback