PA HB1738 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the review and implementation of executive orders issued by the President of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the review and implementation of executive orders issued by the President of the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1738 PN 2369, FP (Y: 132 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02845 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-20SenateFirst consideration
2022-09-20SenateReported as committed
2021-12-15SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-12-14SenateIn the Senate
2021-12-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (132-71)
2021-12-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-12-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-12-13HouseSecond consideration
2021-11-17HouseRemoved from table
2021-11-08HouseLaid on the table
2021-11-08HouseFirst consideration
2021-11-08HouseReported as amended
2021-07-30HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1738
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1738&pn=1969
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1738&pn=2369
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1738P2369.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=11/08/2021&RollCallId=1016
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=11/08/2021&RollCallId=1017
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=659
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/14/2021&RollCallId=1150
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=09/20/2022&RollCallId=1367

Bill Comments

feedback