PA HB1733 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for wine expanded permits.
Title
In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for wine expanded permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-07-21 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |